IL SB1758 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0995
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Treasurer Act. Modifies the term "qualified expenses" for the purpose of participant requirements in the use of the College Savings Pool established under the Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TREASURER-COLLEGE SAVINGS POOL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 47 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0995
2018-08-20SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 053-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2018-05-30HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-05-30HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 067-047-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-30HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2018-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-22HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-18HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-27HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1550516.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1758&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1758.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1758eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1758enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0995.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1758ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1758ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1758_04272017_036000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1758_05302018_028000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1758ham002_05312018_034000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback