IL SB1758 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Treasurer Act. Modifies the term "qualified expenses" for the purpose of participant requirements in the use of the College Savings Pool established under the Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TREASURER-COLLEGE SAVINGS POOL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-27HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1550516.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback