IL SB1754 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Home Birth Safety Act. Provides for the licensure of midwives by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation and for certain limitations on the activities of licensed midwives. Creates the Illinois Midwifery Board. Sets forth provisions concerning application, qualifications, grounds for disciplinary action, and administrative procedures. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to set a repeal date for the new Act of January 1, 2028. Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987, the Nurse Practice Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code to make related changes.
Title
HOME BIRTH SAFETY ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-002-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 60 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 50-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.38 | New Code | See Bill Text |