IL SB1752 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Prohibits employees of the Illinois Gaming Board and certain family members from being employed by or receiving any type of compensation from a person or entity licensed by the Board, including a person or entity that contracts with such a licensee, within one year after leaving employment with the Board. Amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Prohibits a Board member and individuals with certain relationships with a Board member from being an employee of or having a contractual relationship with a gambling operation subject to the jurisdiction of the Board, including video gaming. Provides that if a member violates the prohibition, it is grounds for removal from the Board by the Governor. Prohibits a Board employee and individuals with certain relationships with a Board employee from being an employee of or having a contractual relationship with a gambling operation subject to the jurisdiction of the Board, including video gaming.
Title
RIVERBOAT-BOARD-PROHIBITIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Gaming |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 10 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1752&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1752.htm |