IL SB1752 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Modifies the term "public employee" or "employee" to explicitly exclude all existing and future position numbers of any employee of the Department of Human Services who is classified as or who holds the position of Public Service Administrator (Option 8N) or Internal Security Investigator II, for the purposes of the Act and contracts negotiated or entered into under the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LABOR-DHS EMPLOYEE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53153Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback