IL SB1749 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that stalking against a child is a Class 3 felony. Provides that aggravated stalking against a child is a Class 2 felony. Defines "child". Defines "sex offense" for purposes of registration as a child sex offender to include these offenses. Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Requires registration under the Act for a person convicted of stalking or aggravated stalking against a child. Makes technical changes.
Title
CRIM CD-STALKING-CHILD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-05 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 11-9.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-7.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-7.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 150 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |