IL SB1748 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0313
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0313
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Provides that a community mental health or developmental services agency shall collect and securely store identifying and contact information for each individual resident. Provides that this information may include, but not be limited to, a current photograph, personal contact information, guardian or emergency contact information, and a log of all off-site overnight visits. Provides that this information shall be updated periodically.
Title
COMMUNITY-INTEGRATED LIVING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0313 |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Effective Date August 24, 2017 |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-001-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-05-29 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-28 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Righter |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |