IL SB1747 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-31 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-31 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Provides that certain tax incentives created in the introduced bill take effect on January 1, 2022 (in the introduced bill, January 1, 2021). Removes certain obsolete cross-references. Makes formatting changes concerning tax credits and adds conforming changes to the Illinois Income Tax Act. With respect to the investment credit created in the introduced bill, requires the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to provide a tax credit certificate indicating the credit amount and the year in which the property is placed in service. Amends the Illinois Enterprise Zone Act. Provides for the decertification of Enterprise Zones if 80% or more of the businesses receiving tax incentives within that Enterprise Zone fail to submit certain required information. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-GREEN ENERGY
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-06-02 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-05-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-13 | House | First Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-05-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-011-000 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Bush |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Bush |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bush |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 009-001-000 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 009-001-000 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 9-221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 9-222 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 9-222.1B | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.935 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 805 | 8.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 120 | 5k-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |