IL SB1746 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. In a provision that requires contracts to be awarded to the lowest responsible bidder, removes the exception for contracts for materials and work that have been awarded to the lowest responsible bidder but must be revised, causing expenditures not in excess of 10% of the contract price. Adds an exception for contracts for the purchase of perishable foods and perishable beverages.
Title
COM COL-CONTRACT BID-EXCEPTION
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Dillard [R] | Rep. Mike Bost [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2013-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 012-000-000 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 805 | 3-27.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |