IL SB1744 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-31 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-31 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, if an applicant who qualifies for the senior citizens assessment freeze homestead exemption moves to a different residence in the State and continues to qualify for the exemption, then the new residence shall qualify for the exemption beginning with the taxable year in which the qualified applicant takes ownership of the new residence. Provides that the base year shall be the year prior to the year in which the qualified applicant takes ownership of the new residence. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SENIOR FREEZE
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Dale Fowler [R] | Sen. Jason Plummer [R] | Sen. Brian Stewart [R] |
Sen. Dave Syverson [R] | Sen. Craig Wilcox [R] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1744&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1744.htm |