IL SB1744 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, and the Electricity Excise Tax Law. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall issue certificates of exemption to qualified Illinois data centers. Provides that qualified tangible personal property used in the construction or operation of a certified data center is exempt from the taxes imposed under the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that certified data centers are exempt from the tax imposed under the Electricity Excise Tax Law. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

USE/OCC-DATA CENTERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-11-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20605605-1020New CodeSee Bill Text
351053-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351103-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351153-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-5Amended CodeCitation Text
356402-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback