IL SB1743 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services, in coordination with specified entities, to develop and process a standardized survey to gather feedback from children who are aging out of foster care and from children who have transitioned out of the foster care system. Provides that the survey shall include requests for information regarding the children's experience with and opinion of State foster care services, the children's recommendations for improvement of such services, the amount of time the children spent in the foster care system, and any other information deemed relevant by the Department. Provides that after the survey is created the Department shall circulate the survey to all youth participating in transitional living programs, independent living programs, or Youth in College and to all youth receiving scholarships or tuition waivers under the DCFS Scholarship Program. Requires the Department to conduct the survey every 5 years and to submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly at the completion of each survey. Provides that the first report shall be submitted no later than December 1, 2021 and shall provide a detailed review of the survey results.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-FOSTER CARE SURVEY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-26SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0166
2019-07-26SenateEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-07-26SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2019
2019-05-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2019-05-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-26HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 011-000-000
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
2019-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-21HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-03-20HouseArrived in House
2019-03-20SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-001-002
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019
2019-03-12SenateDo Pass Human Services; 010-000-000
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-05SenatePostponed - Human Services
2019-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2050542New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback