IL SB1742 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Estate and Generation-Skipping Transfer Tax Act. Provides that, for persons dying on or after January 1, 2020, the exclusion amount shall be the applicable exclusion amount under the Internal Revenue Code. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ESTATE TAX-EXCLUSION AMOUNT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-03-06SenateTo Subcommittee on Tax Exemptions and Credits
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
354052Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback