IL SB1739 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0083
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Act. Provides that any written review or findings of the Board staff set forth in the State Board Staff Report concerning an application for a permit must be made available to the public and the applicant (currently, only the public) at least 14 calendar days before the meeting of the State Board at which the review or findings are considered. Provides that members of the public and the applicant (currently, only members of the public) shall have until 10 days before the meeting of the State Board to submit any written response concerning the Board staff's written review or findings. Provides that the State Board shall, among other powers and duties, elect a Vice Chairman to preside over State Board meetings and otherwise act in place of the Chairman when the Chairman is unavailable. Provides that State Board staff shall, among other powers and duties, issue advisory opinions upon request. Provides that staff advisory opinions do not constitute determinations by the State Board. Provides that determinations by the State Board are made through the declaratory ruling process. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IL HEALTH FACILITIES PLANNING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0083
2019-07-15SenateEffective Date July 15, 2019
2019-07-15SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 055-000-001
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Public Health
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 29, 2019
2019-05-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2019-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-05-28HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 019-000-000
2019-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 015-000-000
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-13HouseArrived in House
2019-03-13SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-05SenateDo Pass Public Health; 010-000-000
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20396012Amended CodeCitation Text
20396012.2Amended CodeCitation Text
2039606Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1739&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1739.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1739eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1739enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0083.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1739ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1739ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1739_03132019_010000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB1739_05282019_015000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1739ham002_05302019_042000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback