IL SB1739 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0083
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0083
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with changes. Removes discontinuation of a health care facility from the list of projects eligible for exemption rather than a permit. Provides that the Health Facilities and Services Review Board may accept an application for an exemption for the discontinuation of a category of service at a health care facility only once in a 6-month period following (1) the previous application for exemption at the same health care facility or (2) the final decision of the Board regarding the discontinuation of a category service at the same health care facility, whichever occurs later. Provides that a discontinuation of a category of service shall otherwise require an application for a permit if an application for an exemption has already been accepted within the 6-month period. Provides that the Board shall provide by rule for an expedited process for obtaining an exemption for a change of ownership among related persons (rather than any change of ownership). Adds a Section concerning applications for permit for discontinuation of a health care facility or category of service. Provides that upon a finding that an application to close a health care facility or discontinue a category of service is complete, the Board shall publish a legal notice on 3 consecutive days in a newspaper of general circulation in the area or community to be affected and afford the public an opportunity to request a hearing. Provides further specified public notice requirements. Provides that no later than 30 days after issuance of a permit to close a health care facility or discontinue a category of service, the permit holder shall give written notice of the closure or discontinuation to the State Senator and State Representative serving the legislative district in which the health care facility is located. Provides that if there is a pending lawsuit that challenges an application to discontinue a health care facility that either names the Board as a party or alleges fraud in the filings of the application, the Board may defer action on the application for up to 6 months from the date of the initial deferral of the application. Adds a Section concerning certificates of exemption for change of ownership of a health care facility, and makes changes concerning notice and the closure of a health care facility or the discontinuation of a category of service at a health care facility. Provides that specified changes shall apply to all applications submitted after the effective date of this amendatory Act of the 101st General Assembly. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
IL HEALTH FACILITIES PLANNING
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0083 |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Effective Date July 15, 2019 |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 055-000-001 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Public Health |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2019-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-05-28 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-19 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 010-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3960 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3960 | 12.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3960 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |