IL SB1739 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Provides that a student who is already licensed to teach and is enrolled in a course of study leading to an additional teaching endorsement or a master's degree in an academic field in which he or she is teaching or plans to teach may participate in the Minority Teachers of Illinois scholarship program (rather than limiting the program to undergraduate students). Makes a conforming change. Effective June 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-MINORITY TEACHERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0235
2017-08-18SenateEffective Date June 1, 2018
2017-08-18SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2017-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-19HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-18HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-18HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-18HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-18HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 016-000-000
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-27HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Education; 012-000-000
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Education
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Education
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11094750Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback