IL SB1737 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code in provisions concerning credit allowed a domestic ceding insurer. Provides that the assuming insurer shall provide or make certain information to be reported to the Director of Insurance available to the ceding insurer and that the assuming insurer may decline to release trade secrets or commercially sensitive information that would qualify as exempt from disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act. With regard to an assuming insurer's trust fund, provides that not later than February 28 of each year, the assuming insurer's chief executive officer or chief financial officer shall certify to the Director that the trust fund contains funds in an amount not less than the assuming insurer's liabilities attributable to reinsurance ceded by U.S. ceding insurers, and in addition, a trusteed surplus of not less than $20,000,000. Permits a reduction in the required trusteed surplus in specified circumstances. Provides that in the event that the provision concerning the reduction in the required trusteed surplus applies to the trust, the assuming insurer's chief executive officer or chief financial officer shall then certify to the Director that the trust fund contains funds in an amount not less than the assuming insurer's liabilities attributable to reinsurance ceded by U.S. ceding insurers, and in addition, a reduced trusteed surplus of not less than the amount that has been authorized by the regulatory authority having principal regulatory oversight of the trust. Makes changes to provisions concerning financial strength ratings. Sets forth provisions concerning downgrades by rating agencies, the Director's authority, upgrading the rating of a certified reinsurer, and the revocation of the certification of a certified reinsurer. Makes other changes.
Title
INS CD-DOMESTIC CEDING INSURER
Sponsors
Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Michael Unes [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] |
Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 89 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1118 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Effective Date February 1, 2019; Some provisions |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Effective Date November 27, 2018; Some provisions |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Amendatory Veto Overridden Both Houses |
2018-11-27 | House | Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 089-020-001 |
2018-11-27 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-20 | House | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-11-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2018-11-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 052-000-000 |
2018-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-08-26 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 042-005-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 042-005-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 085-028-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-31 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2018-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-010-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-04-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 173.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |