IL SB1737 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0286
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0286
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, if the taxpayer is notified on or before October 1 of any year that he or she owes an arrearage of taxes due to an administrative error, then the county collector may send a separate bill for the arrearages of taxes, which may be due no sooner than 30 days after the due date for the next installment of taxes.
Title
PROP TX-ADMINISTRATIVE ERROR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0286 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001 |
2013-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2013-05-09 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-05-09 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000 |
2013-05-02 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2013-04-15 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2013-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 14-41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 21-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 21-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 21-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |