IL SB1737 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0634
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0634
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Makes the following changes with respect to the contract preference for sheltered workshops: changes references from handicapped persons to persons with disabilities; names the advisory committee the State Use Committee and adds members; requires the Governor to fill Committee vacancies within 30 days after notice of a vacancy; requires the Committee to develop a 5-year plan for increased State procurements from not-for-profit agencies serving persons with disabilities; and requires chief procurement officers, in consultation with the Committee, to determine which items are available from those not-for-profit agencies and to give priority to those agencies when making procurements. Effective immediately.
Title
PROCUREMENT ST USE COMMITTEE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-27 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-24 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0634 | |
2009-08-24 | Effective Date August 24, 2009 | |
2009-08-24 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-27 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000 | |
2009-05-22 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-05-21 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-21 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 17, 2009 | |
2009-05-15 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-05-14 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Bassi | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-22 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-22 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-02 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2009 | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-20 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio |