IL SB1735 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that for purposes of determining eligibility and the amount of assistance under the Code, the Department of Human Services and local governmental units shall exclude from consideration, for a period of no more than 60 months, any financial assistance, including wages, cash transfers, or gifts, that is provided to a person who is enrolled in a program or research project that is not funded with general revenue funds and that is intended to investigate the impacts of policies or programs designed to reduce poverty, promote social mobility, or increase financial stability for Illinois residents if there is an explicit plan to collect data and evaluate the program or initiative that is developed prior to participants in the study being enrolled in the program and if a research team has been identified to oversee the evaluation. Requires the Department to seek all necessary federal approvals or waivers to implement the provisions of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
PUB AID-RESEARCH PROJECT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0415 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date August 16, 2019 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-041-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 010-007-000 |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 035-017-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 007-003-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 1-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |