IL SB1735 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Short-Term Rental Act. Provides that units of local government may not enact or enforce an ordinance, regulation, or plan that has the express or practical effect of prohibiting short-term rentals. Restricts the use of or regulation of short-term rentals based on their classification, use, or occupancy. Allows the regulation of short-term rentals to protect public health, safety, sanitation, traffic control, solid or hazardous waste control, pollution control, and other specified circumstances. Provides that a unit of local government may not tax a short-term rental marketplace or require them to collect taxes from occupants, but the short-term rental marketplace may voluntarily apply, calculate, collect and remit any tax imposed by the unit of local government on the owner or occupant of a short-term rental. Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SHORT-TERM RENTAL REGULATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-17SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-05-10SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-05-05SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-05SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback