IL SB1735 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions of the Workers' Compensation Act and the Workers' Occupational Diseases Act providing that the disability of a firefighter, emergency medical technician, or paramedic resulting from a condition or health impairment that results directly or indirectly from any bloodborne pathogen, lung or respiratory disease or condition, heart or vascular disease or condition, hypertension, tuberculosis, or cancer is rebuttably presumed to arise out of and in the course of employment and to be causally connected to the hazards or exposures of the employment. Provides that the presumption does not apply to a condition or impairment of health that results from any cancer, lung or respiratory disease or condition, or heart or vascular disease or condition if the employee used cigarettes or other tobacco products within the 60-month period preceding the filing of an Application for Adjustment of Claim.
Title
WRK COMP-FIREFIGHTER-TOBACCO
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Cronin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-12 | Held in Labor | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Labor | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Cronin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1735&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1735.htm |