IL SB1734 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0992
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0992
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Eminent Domain Act. Provides that quick-take powers may be used for a period of no more than 2 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act by Cook County and the Village of Forest View for the acquisition of certain described property for the purpose of installing a traffic signal at the intersection of 49th Street and Central Avenue. Repeals the new provisions 3 years after the effective date. Effective immediately.
Title
EMINENT DOMAIN-COOK COUNTY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0992 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2022-04-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 017-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2022-04-07 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - April 7, 2022 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-006-001 |
2022-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-04 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-04 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000 |
2022-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-03-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2021-11-29 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-10-20 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III |