IL SB1733 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cemetery Protection Act. Defines "cemetery consumer". Provides that unless the contract with the cemetery otherwise provides, the involved cemetery consumer shall have the responsibility to repair, replace, or remove any dilapidated or unsafe columbarium, niche building, mausoleum, or private estate within the cemetery grounds. Provides that whenever a cemetery authority becomes aware of a dilapidated or unsafe columbarium, niche building, mausoleum, or private estate within the cemetery grounds, and when the involved cemetery consumer has failed to take prompt remedial action, the cemetery may repair, replace, or remove the structure to prevent hazard to the public or to entombed, inurned, or cremated human remains. Provides that the cemetery may remove the urns or caskets when necessary and place them in a secure temporary area in order to allow for the repairs to or replacement or removal of the dilapidated or unsafe columbarium, niche building, mausoleum, or private estate. Provides that the cemetery shall contact the listed next of kin in the cemetery records when taking remedial action.
Title
CEMETERY PROTECTION-REPAIRS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-08 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2022-04-08 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-04-06 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2021-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 835 | .01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 835 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |