IL SB1730 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that, for State Fiscal Year 2020, the Department of Children and Family Services shall increase reimbursement rates payable to each private agency with a purchase of service contract or grant from the Department to an amount that equals the sum of all increases in general inflation during State Fiscal Years 2014 through 2018 as determined by the consumer price index-u published by the Bureau of Labor Statistics of the United States Department of Labor, less any rate increases, previously provided by the Department. Sets forth the types of services eligible for the increased reimbursement rate, including, (i) residential services, (ii) specialized, adolescent, treatment, or other non-traditional or Home-of-Relative foster care services, and (iii) intact family services. Provides that beginning in State Fiscal Year 2020, and for every State fiscal year thereafter, the Department shall implement the rate reimbursement methodology outlined in a specified provision of the Illinois Administrative Code when calculating and determining the payment rates for private agencies that contract with the Department to provide specified services. Provides that, for State Fiscal Year 2021, and for every State fiscal year thereafter, foster parent rates and payment rates for other specified services shall be adjusted each year to an amount that equals any increase in general inflation as determined by the consumer price index-u. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-PAYMENT RATE INCREASES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-04-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-04-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Appropriations I
2019-02-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205055fNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback