IL SB1730 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Renter's Financial Responsibility and Protection Act. Provides that a rental car company may void a damage waiver if damage or loss to the rental vehicle results from the renter losing or otherwise failing to secure the rental vehicle's keys or any other act of negligence by the renter that would reasonably result in the damage or loss to the rental vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RENTAL CAR-DAMAGE WAIVER-VOID

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-001
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-05-29SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-26SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2017
2017-05-26SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-010-000
2017-05-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-04-27HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-001
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Muñoz
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 011-000-000
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Insurance; 014-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Insurance
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Insurance
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6252715Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1730&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1730.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1730eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1730enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1730sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1730sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1730ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1730_04272017_030000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1730_05262017_019000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1730_05302017_006000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback