IL SB1725 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Provides that a physician licensed to practice medicine in all its branches may collaborate with a physician assistant (rather than may delegate care and treatment responsibilities to a physician assistant). Provides that a collaborative agreement shall be for services in the same area of practice or specialty as the collaborating physician in his or her medical practice. Deletes language providing that a physician may enter into collaborative agreements with no more than 7 full-time physician assistants. Amends the Physician Assistant Practice Act of 1987. Provides that a physician assistant in a health professional shortage area with a score greater than or equal to 12 shall own his or her own medical practice. Provides that medical and surgical services provided by a physician assistant include: obtaining and performing comprehensive health histories and physical examinations; evaluating, diagnosing, and providing medical treatment; ordering, performing, and interpreting diagnostic studies and therapeutic procedures; educating patients on health promotion and disease prevention; providing consultation upon request; and writing medical orders. Includes other provisions regarding scope of practice. Deletes language requiring: a written collaborative agreement for all physician assistants to practice in the State; and a written collaborative agreement to describe the working relationship of the physician assistant with the collaborating physician and the categories of care, treatment, or procedures to be provided by the physician assistant. Creates the Physician Assistant Medical Licensing Board (rather than the physician assistant advisory committee). Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANT PRACTICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 60 | 54.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 5.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 6.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 95 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 7.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1725&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1725.htm |