IL SB1722 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Safe Neighborhoods Reform Act. Contains only a short title provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SENTENCING-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 036-012-000
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-05-30HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-05-29HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-05-29HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 070-041-001
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-29HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-003-000
2017-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-04-26HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-26HousePension Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-26HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-26HouseJudicial Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-26HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-26HouseHome Rule Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-26HouseCorrectional Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-26HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-26HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-26HouseFiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-25HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-25HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-25HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-25HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-25HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-25HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-25HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-25HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-25HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-25HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-06HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-06HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-04-06HouseArrived in House
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-04-06SenateThird Reading - Passed; 035-009-004
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Raoul
2017-04-06SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-04-05SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-03-15SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Terry Link
2017-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Filed Corrections Budget & Impact Note as amended by Senate Amendment No. 2
2017-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed As amended by Senate Amendment No. 2
2017-03-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-03-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-005-000
2017-03-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-03-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-03-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2017
2017-03-07SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-03-07SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-15SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1722&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1722.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1722eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1722enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1722sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1722sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1722sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1722sam004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1722ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1722_04062017_001000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1722_05292017_011000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1722_05312017_043000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback