IL SB1720 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Prohibits any person or business that violates the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act, the Minimum Wage Law, the Illinois Worker Adjustment and Retraining Notification Act, the Employee Classification Act, the Day and Temporary Labor Services Act, the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, or any comparable state statute or regulation of any state which governs the payment of wages to do business with the State or any State agency or enter into a subcontract that is subject to the Code for a period of 5 years. Amends the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act. Amends the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act. Provides that an employer that is able to pay wages and who refuses to pay is guilty of a Class 4 felony with respect to amounts of $5,000 or less (rather than a Class B misdemeanor) and of a Class 3 felony with respect to amounts greater than $5,000 (rather than a Class A misdemeanor). Provides that a subsequent failure to pay within 5 years (rather than 2 years) of a prior conviction is a Class 3 felony (rather than a Class 4 felony).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANTI-WAGE THEFT-STATE CONTRACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 30 N: 22 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25SenateGovernor Vetoed
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 032-022-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-30HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-30HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 067-048-000
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-30HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2017-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-009-000
2017-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 030-022-000
2017-04-27SenateVerified
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Labor; 011-005-000
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2017-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3050050-14.6New CodeSee Bill Text
3050050-60Amended CodeCitation Text
82011514Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback