IL SB1718 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Clean Jobs, Workforce and Contractor Equity Act. Creates the Equity and Empowerment in Clean Energy Advisory Board to administer the Clean Jobs Workforce Hubs Program, the Expanding Clean Energy Entrepreneurship and Contractor Incubator Network Program, the Returning Residents Clean Jobs Training Program, and the Illinois Clean Energy Black, Indigenous, and People of Color Primes Contractor Accelerator. Creates the Illinois Clean Energy Jobs and Justice Fund Act, the Community Energy, Climate, and Jobs Planning Act, the Energy Community Reinvestment Act, the Clean Energy Empowerment Zone Tax Credit Act, the Coal Severance Fee Act, the Building Energy Performance Standard Act, and the Public Utilities Intervenor Compensation Act. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to allow for emergency rulemaking. Amends the State Finance Act to create The Energy Community Reinvestment Fund, the Illinois Commerce Commission Intervenor Compensation Fund, and the Illinois Clean Energy Jobs and Justice Fund. Amends the Electric Vehicle Act, the Energy Efficient Building Act the Illinois Power Agency Act, the Illinois Income Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, the School Code, the Public Utilities Act, the Environmental Protection Act, the Illinois Nuclear Facility Safety Act, and the Prevailing Wage Act by making changes to implement certain programs. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CLEAN ENERGY JOBS ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.182 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 3125 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3125 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3125 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3125 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3125 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3125 | 55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 627 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 627 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 627 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 10-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-105.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 16-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-107.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-107.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-107.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 16-107.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-128B | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-131 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 2-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 4-604 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 4-605 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 8-103B | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 8-104.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 8-512 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 9-220.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 9-222.1B | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 9-227 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.935 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.936 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.937 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 120 | 5k-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 9.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 9.15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 9.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
420 | 10 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 100 | 5-49.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 130 | 3.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1718&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1718.htm |