IL SB1715 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a prosecution for any offense based upon misconduct in office by a public officer or employee may be commenced within 2 years (rather than one year) after discovery of the offense by a person having a legal duty to report the offense, or in the absence of the discovery, within 2 years (rather than one year) after the proper prosecuting officer becomes aware of the offense. Provides that in no such case is the period of limitation so extended more than 4 (rather than 3) years beyond the expiration of the period otherwise applicable. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-LIMITATIONS-MISCONDUCT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 007-003-000
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-03-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72053-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback