IL SB1714 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires a consultant to annually disclose to the board of the retirement system, board of the pension fund, or the investment board that retains the consultant certain information concerning searches for investment services from minority owned businesses, female owned businesses, and businesses owned by persons with a disability. Requires a consultant to disclose any compensation or economic opportunity received in the last 24 months from investment advisors retained by the board of a retirement system, board of a pension fund, or investment board. Requires consideration of these disclosures before awarding a contract for consulting services. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-CONSULTANT DISCLOSURES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25SenateGovernor Vetoed
2017-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 012-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-04-27HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4051-113.22New CodeSee Bill Text
4051-113.23New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback