IL SB1714 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $5,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services for Youthbuild programs. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
$DHS-YOUTHBUILD PROGRAMS
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Bond [D] | Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Sen. James Clayborne [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
Sen. Terry Link [D] | Sen. Dave Syverson [R] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Session Sine Die | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-13 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Bond | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Appropriations I | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Brady | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1714&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/PDF/09600SB1714.pdf |