IL SB1712 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-29 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-29 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that a distributor shall not require a retailer to purchase a minimum quantity of wine or spirits for delivery and shall not charge a retailer a fee for the delivery of wine or spirits. Provides that no retail licensee may purchase wine or spirits from, or possess wine or spirits purchased from, any person other than a distributor or importing distributor, except that a retail licensee may purchase 20 liters or less of wine or spirits from another retail licensee in a one-month period if specified conditions are met. Provides that no original package of wine or spirits may be transferred from one retail licensee to any other retail licensee without permission from the Illinois Liquor Control Commission, except that if the same retailer holds more than one retail license, original packages of wine or spirits may be transferred from one of the retail licensee's licensed locations to another of that retail licensee's licensed locations without prior permission from the State Commission, subject to specified conditions. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-RETAILERS-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-29 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 6-17.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
235 | 5 | 6-40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
235 | 5 | 6-9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1712&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1712.htm |