IL SB1707 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Pilot Program Act. Provides that all persons providing medical cannabis related services under the Act for a cultivation center shall hold certification as a Certified Medical Cannabis Cultivation Center Agent. Provides that all persons providing medical cannabis related services under the Act for a dispensing organization shall hold certification as a Certified Medical Cannabis Dispensing Organization Agent or Dispensing Organization Agent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAL CANNABIS PILOT PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-06-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 052-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-009-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-30HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-05-30HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 022-000-000
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-25HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lou Lang
2018-01-03HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-002-000
2017-08-31HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-08-31HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-08-31HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-08-31HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-08-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-08-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-08-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-08-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-08-16HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-08-16HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 31, 2017
2017-08-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-08-16HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-004-000
2017-05-29HouseSuspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-05-29HouseMoved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-29HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-29HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-05-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-26HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 044-004-000
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Raoul
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul
2017-05-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass Public Health; 007-001-000
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-07SenateRe-referred to Public Health
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
410130105Amended CodeCitation Text
410130130Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1707&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1707.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1707eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1707enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1707sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1707sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1707ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1707ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1707ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1707_05262017_046000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1707_05302018_027000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1707ham003_05312018_033000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback