IL SB1706 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Uniform Environmental Covenants Act. Removes language providing that "environmental response project" includes a plan or work that is performed for environmental remediation of any site or facility in response to contamination at specified sites or facilities. Provides instead that "environmental response project" includes a plan or work that is performed or conducted to clean up, remediate, eliminate, investigate, minimize, mitigate, or prevent the release or threatened release of contaminants affecting real property in order to protect public health or welfare or the environment. Removes the definition of "State".
Title
ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSE PROJECT
Sponsors
Sen. Adriane Johnson [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 122 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1706&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1706.htm |