IL SB1706 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - To Subcommittee on Auto Insurance Rates
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Use of Credit Information in Personal Insurance Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25SenateTo Subcommittee on Auto Insurance Rates
2017-05-25SenateRe-assigned to Insurance
2017-05-25SenateRule 2-10(e) Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-04SenateTo Subcommittee on Auto Insurance Rates
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-04-25SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2017-04-25SenateRe-assigned to Insurance
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-04-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-04-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-04-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Insurance
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Insurance
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21515715Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback