IL SB1702 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the hospital credit applies for tax years ending on or after December 31, 2012 and ending on or before December 31, 2022 (currently, the credit sunsets on December 31, 2017 by operation of the Act's automatic sunset provision). Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-HOSPITAL CREDIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-04-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 006-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 223 | Amended Code | Citation Text |