IL SB1701 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Home Rule Administrative Procedure Act. Provides that home rule municipalities and home rule counties shall adopt all rules through the procedures required by the Act. Provides for procedures for general rulemaking, implementing discretionary powers, incorporation by reference, emergency rulemaking, and peremptory rulemaking. Provides for the creation of a Designated Review Committee composed of 5 members of the governing board of the home rule unit. Provides for agenda, notice, public hearing, and publication requirements. Limits home rule powers. Defines terms. Amends the Counties Code and Illinois Municipal Code making conforming changes. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOME RULE-RULEMAKING PROCEDURE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-05SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.41New CodeSee Bill Text
5555-1069Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1069.3Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-4-2Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-4-2.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback