IL SB1700 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Property Assessed Clean Energy Act. Provides that a local unit of government may establish a property assessed clean energy program. Provides that, to finance or refinance one or more energy projects on the property covered by the program, a local unit of government may impose an assessment pursuant to the terms of an assessment contract with the record owner of the property to be assessed. Provides that a local unit of government may issue bonds to finance energy projects under a property assessed clean energy program. Contains other provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
PROPERTY-CLEAN ENERGY
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] |
Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-18 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; McConnaughay |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; McConnaughay |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |