IL SB1698 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Modifies provisions concerning what the term "wages" does not include for calendar years 2023 through 2027. Removes specified provisions regarding remuneration paid to an individual for calendar years 2005 through 2020. Provides that, with respect to any benefit year beginning on or after January 1, 2025 (rather than 2023) and before January 1, 2026 (rather than 2024), "maximum weekly benefit amount" with respect to each week beginning within a benefit period means 40.6% (rather than 42.4%) of the statewide average weekly wage, rounded to the next higher dollar. Provides that, with respect to any benefit year beginning on or after January 1, 2025 (rather than 2023) and before January 1, 2026 (rather than 2024), any otherwise eligible individual shall be entitled, during such benefit year, to a maximum total amount of benefits equal to 23 (rather than 24) times his or her weekly benefit amount plus dependents' allowances, or to the total wages for insured work paid to such individual during the individual's base period, whichever is smaller. In provisions concerning solvency adjustments, makes specified changes to what balance the trust fund needs to meet for the rate adjustments to apply. Provides that the target balance in calendar year 2023 and each calendar year thereafter is $1,750,000,000. Provides that if an appropriation is made in calendar year 2023 to this State's account in the Unemployment Trust Fund, as a loan solely for purposes of paying unemployment insurance benefits under this Act and without the accrual of interest, from a fund of the State treasury, the Director shall take all necessary action to transfer 10% of the total amount of the appropriation from this State's account in the Unemployment Trust Fund to the State's Budget Stabilization Fund prior to July 1 of each year or as soon thereafter as practical. Makes other changes. Provides that if funds from the State treasury are not appropriated on or before January 31, 2023, then previously described provisions are inoperative. Instead, reinserts certain provisions previously described but changes the benefit years described to 2024 and 2025. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2023.
Title
ACCESS TO JUSTICE FUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 45 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 45 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 45 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1105 |
2022-12-08 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-12-08 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-12-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-12-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2022-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 045-008-000 |
2022-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 3/5 Vote Required |
2022-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 045-008-000 |
2022-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 3/5 Vote Required |
2022-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2022-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2022-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 - December 1, 2022 |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 |
2022-12-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-008-002 |
2022-12-01 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2022-12-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-12-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2022-12-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-12-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-12-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-12-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2022-12-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-12-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-11-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 015-000-000 |
2022-11-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2022-11-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-11-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2022-11-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-11-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-11-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-11-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-11-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2022-11-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-Referred to Executive Committee |
2022-11-29 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2022-11-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-11-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-11-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 14, 2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 705 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 95 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |