IL SB1697 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Administration Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that if the U.S. Department of Agriculture's Food and Nutrition Service creates and makes available to the states a waiver permitting recipients of benefits provided under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP) to use their SNAP benefits to purchase hot foods at grocery stores, the Department of Human Services shall apply for the waiver. If the U.S. Department of Agriculture approves the Department of Human Services' waiver application, then the Department of Human Services shall adopt rules and make other changes as necessary to implement the approved waiver.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SNAP-HOT FOODS-GROCERY STORES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2023-02-21SenateAssigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services
2023-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
2023-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2023-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
2023-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2023-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305512-4.57New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback