IL SB1697 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with changes. Provides that the requirements established under the Grant Accountability and Transparency Act do not apply to allocations of State revenues paid over by the Comptroller to units of local government and other taxing districts pursuant to the State Revenue Sharing Act from the Local Government Distributive Fund or the Personal Property Tax Replacement Fund, or to allotments of State motor fuel tax revenues distributed by the Department of Transportation to units of local government pursuant to the Motor Fuel Tax Law from the Motor Fuel Tax Fund or the Transportation Renewal Fund. Amends the Downstate Public Transportation Act. Provides that commencing with State fiscal year 2022 programs, and for each fiscal year thereafter, all appropriations made under the provisions of the Act shall not constitute a grant program subject to the requirements of the Grant Accountability and Transparency Act. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall approve programs of proposed expenditures and services submitted by participants under specified provisions. Provides that in the event the Department is prevented from processing applications or certifying that a participant meets specified requirements due to extraordinary circumstances beyond its control, the certification deadline for that application shall be stayed until the Department is able to process and certify the same. Provides that notice from the Department, as well as an explanation of the extraordinary circumstances, shall be provided to each participant affected by such delay. Provides for the adoption of rules to govern participants. Provides requirements for participant applications for funding concerning a program of proposed expenditures and services. Provides additional requirements for specified units of local government when applying for the approval of the program of proposed expenditures and services. Specifies further requirements for participants to receive funding. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GATA-HIGHER ED AWARDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateSent to the Governor
2021-06-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2021-06-01SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-06-01Senate3/5 Vote Required
2021-06-01SenateSenate Concurs
2021-06-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2021-06-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 3/5 Vote Required
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2021-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 31, 2021
2021-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3
2021-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2021-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
2021-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2021-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 015-000-000
2021-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2021-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2021-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
2021-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-05-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 015-000-000
2021-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2021-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-13HouseRemoved from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-05-12HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Executive Committee; 014-000-000
2021-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-04-28HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-04-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2021-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2021-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2021
2021-03-24SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021
2021-03-16SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 013-000-000
2021-03-09SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3070820Amended CodeCitation Text
3070825Amended CodeCitation Text
3070845Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1697&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1697.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1697eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1697enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1697ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1697ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1697ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1697_04212021_025000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB1697_05312021_010000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1697ham003_05312021_050000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback