IL SB1697 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that it is a violation for an employer to impose as a condition of obtaining or retaining employment any term or condition that requires a person to violate or forgo a sincerely held practice of his or her religion including the wearing of any attire, clothing, or facial hair in accordance with the requirements of his or her religion. Effective immediately.
Title
HUMAN RTS-RELIG-HAIR-CLOTHING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0100 |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Effective Date August 11, 2017 |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-018-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 022-003-000 |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-04-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 2-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |