IL SB1696 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that during the first quarter of State Fiscal Year 2020, the Department of Healthcare of Family Services must convene a technical advisory group consisting of members of all trade associations representing Illinois skilled nursing providers to discuss changes necessary with the federal implementation of Medicare's Patient-Driven Payment Model. Provides that implementation of Medicare's Patient-Driven Payment Model shall, by September 1, 2020, end the collection of the MDS data that is necessary to maintain the current RUG-IV Medicaid payment methodology. Requires the technical advisory group to consider a revised reimbursement methodology that takes into account transparency, accountability, actual staffing as reported under the federally required Payroll Based Journal system, changes to the minimum wage, adequacy in coverage of the cost of care, and a quality component that rewards quality improvements. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-TECHNICAL ADVISORY GROUP
Sponsors
Sen. Heather Steans [D] | Rep. Yehiel Kalish [D] | Rep. Michael Unes [R] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] |
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0348 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 010-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |