IL SB1696 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Muslim American Advisory Council Act. Creates the Illinois Muslim American Advisory Council. Provides for the appointment of members to the Council and member requirements. Provides requirements for meetings of the Council. Requires the Council to issue semi-annual reports on its policy recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly. Defines terms. Provides a severability clause. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUSLIM ADVISORY COUNCIL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 44 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-05-30HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 067-044-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 007-005-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-05-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-15HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-15HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-04-27HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 040-009-000
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-04-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-002-000
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - State Government
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback