IL SB1696 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $10 million, or so much thereof as may be necessary, from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for the expansion of its Job Training and Economic Development Grant Program. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
$DCEO-JOB TRAINING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Session Sine Die | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-19 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-03-09 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs | |
2009-03-06 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-03-06 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2009-03-06 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-06 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2009-03-05 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-03-05 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | |
2009-03-05 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2009-03-05 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Appropriations I | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1696&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/PDF/09600SB1696.pdf |