IL SB1695 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that the reimbursement amount for certain child care services shall be increased by at least 8%. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to provide additional training for Department representatives who work with early childhood education providers. Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Provides that the Illinois Student Assistance Commission may award a grant to an eligible applicant enrolled in an early childhood education program who, after graduation, will work in a child care facility. Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Provides that the Department shall ensure that the amount of time it takes to complete a criminal background investigation does not exceed 90 days. Provides that certain classes and trainings shall be waived for licensed day care home providers, licensed group day care home providers, and licensed day care center directors and classroom staff to the extent the classes and trainings are duplicative of an individual's educational training or if the individual has a master's or bachelor's degree in early childhood education or an equivalent subject. Provides that the Department shall implement a child care facility educator substitution pool program, which shall provide to child care facilities the contact information for early childhood educators willing to provide substitute services to other child care facilities in a specified geographic area.
Title
CHILD CARE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 947 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 505 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 505 | 5a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 10 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 10 | 4.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1695&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1695.htm |