IL SB1695 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-9)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends Public Act 99-524 to make supplemental appropriations. Reduces certain appropriations from the Commitment to Human Services Fund for funeral and burial expenses from $8,775,000 to $575,000. Appropriates $8,200,000 from the Personal Property Tax Replacement Fund for those funeral and burial expenses. Appropriates $18, 635,000 from the Commitment to Human Services Fund to the Department of Human Services for costs associated with the Domestic Violence Shelters and Services Program. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DOMESTIC VIOLENCE SHELTERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2017
2017-05-05SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-03-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass Appropriations I; 009-000-000
2017-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Appropriations I
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback