IL SB1694 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Labor and Storage Lien Act and the Labor and Storage Lien (Small Amount) Act. Provides that a person, firm, or private corporation seeking to impose fees in connection with the furnishing of storage for a vehicle shall provide notice of the fees to the vehicle owner of record as well as to the lienholder of record. Provides that notice shall be given regardless of whether the person seeking to impose fees enforces a lien. Provides that the notification requirements apply in addition to any owner and lienholder notice requirements under the Illinois Vehicle Code relating to the removal or towing of an abandoned, lost, stolen, or unclaimed vehicle. Provides penalties for noncompliance. Provides that notwithstanding any provision to the contrary, a person, firm, or private corporation seeking to impose storage fees for a vehicle in its possession may not foreclose or otherwise enforce its lien unless it first complies with specified notification requirements. Provides that storage fees may be paid by, among other methods, debit card and credit card. Makes corresponding changes in the Illinois Vehicle Code. Further amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a towed vehicle must be returned to, among other entities, a lienholder, within 30 minutes if requested during business hours. Effective immediately.
Title
LABOR&STORAGE LIENS-NOTICES
Sponsors
Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0311 |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Effective Date November 22, 2017 |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation |
2017-05-19 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-05-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-003-000 |
2017-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-17 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-05-11 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-04-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 4-203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 4-216 | New Code | See Bill Text |
770 | 45 | 1.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
770 | 50 | 1.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |